|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 326, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment. (Enrolled measure version corrected August 25.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 9. Page 2668.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
To Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 792.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 557.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|