|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 617, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4644.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6177.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Coms. on PUB. S. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 2734.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2693.)
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Set for hearing January 21. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 704.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|