|
08/31/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6956.)
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 3780.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3427.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3083.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|