06/14/2010 | Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Liu. | |||
04/27/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
04/26/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3297.) | |||
04/08/2010 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
04/07/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |||
02/25/2010 | To Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |||
02/18/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |