05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
04/26/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
04/06/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3002.) | |||
03/10/2010 | Set for hearing March 23. | |||
02/25/2010 | To Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
02/18/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |