LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1105
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1105
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1105
Action History
04/14/2010
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/09/2010
Set for hearing April 21.
04/08/2010
Hearing postponed by committee.
03/04/2010
Set for hearing April 7.
02/25/2010
To Com. on B., F. & I.
02/18/2010
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
02/17/2010
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.