|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 6. Page 3275.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2986.)
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|