|
06/30/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 3698.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3427.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3299.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3084.)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Coms. on F. & A. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|