LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1109
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1109
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1109
Action History
04/14/2010
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 6. Page 3210.) Reconsideration granted.
03/12/2010
Set for hearing April 14.
02/25/2010
To Com. on HEALTH.
02/18/2010
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
02/17/2010
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.