|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 558, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 2368.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3074.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 17.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 542.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 383.)
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|