LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1110
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1110
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1110
Action History
04/20/2010
Set for hearing April 28. Hearing postponed by committee.
04/15/2010
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
04/08/2010
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
02/25/2010
To Com. on RLS.
02/18/2010
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
02/17/2010
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.