05/19/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/22/2010 | Set for hearing April 22. (For vote only.) Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 1. Page 3294.) | |||
04/19/2010 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
04/12/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
04/07/2010 | Set for hearing April 19. | |||
04/06/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/25/2010 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
03/09/2010 | Set for hearing April 5. | |||
02/25/2010 | To Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. | |||
02/18/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |