|
05/27/2010
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3307.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee. Joint Rule 61(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3209.)
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|