|
06/14/2010
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Wolk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 20. Page 3788.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wolk. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3788.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3671.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3305.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3185.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|