08/23/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 178, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/23/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
08/13/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m. | |||
08/10/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
08/02/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6004.) To Senate. | |||
06/24/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/23/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |||
05/06/2010 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/15/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/15/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3194.) To Assembly. | |||
04/06/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3085.) | |||
03/09/2010 | Set for hearing April 6. | |||
02/18/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |