|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 286, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4925.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6672.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6425.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 3659.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3498.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3016.)
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Coms. on ED. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|