06/28/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/28/2010 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 4096.) To Assembly. | |||
06/17/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/16/2010 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
05/27/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/26/2010 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. | |||
05/07/2010 | Set for hearing May 17. | |||
04/28/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/27/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3297.) | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
04/15/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |||
04/08/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/25/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/18/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |