05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/03/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/22/2010 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/20/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3293.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/01/2010 | Set for hearing April 19. | |||
02/25/2010 | To Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
02/19/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |