|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 321, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4910.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6494.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6427.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 3775.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 22. Noes 6. Page 3649.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Negrete McLeod. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 3649.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3163.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|