05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
04/26/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
04/06/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3016.) | |||
03/22/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/09/2010 | Set for hearing March 24. | |||
02/25/2010 | To Com. on ED. | |||
02/19/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |