|
05/27/2010
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3162.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|