|
08/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 3722.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3594.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Set for hearing May 24. (For vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Set, final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 4. Page 3547.) Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3180.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|