|
08/31/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) Re-referred to Com. On RULES pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6432.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 7. Page 3622.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3335.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3180.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Coms. on G.O. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|