LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1136
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1136
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1136
Compare Versions
SB1136 Amended August 2, 2010
SB1136 Amended June 1, 2010
SB1136 Amended April 19, 2010
SB1136 Amended March 22, 2010
SB1136 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB1136 Amended August 2, 2010
SB1136 Amended June 1, 2010
SB1136 Amended April 19, 2010
SB1136 Amended March 22, 2010
SB1136 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare