|
08/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
To Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 3520.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3498.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3299.)
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3084.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Coms. on F. & A. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|