|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 639, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2010
|
To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Correctly enrolled. Held at Desk pursuant to Joint Rule 57.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 4885.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 6370.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 5929.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
To Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3195.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3164.)
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|