02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/28/2009 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/19/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/20/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/14/2009 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
04/02/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 420.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/16/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/12/2009 | Set for hearing April 1. | |||
02/05/2009 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |||
01/30/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 1. | |||
01/29/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |