|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 323, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 4921.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6507.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6352.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6324.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on NAT. RES. and AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 3694.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3498.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3307.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee. Joint Rule 61(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3209.)
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|