|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 640, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4926.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6675.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6424.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committe August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3723.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3498.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3305.)
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Coms. on B., F. & I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|