05/27/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/25/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. | |||
05/24/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/20/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/13/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3165.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/09/2010 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
04/08/2010 | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and RLS. | |||
02/25/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/19/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |