|
08/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 3700.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3672.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3069.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|