08/11/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
08/11/2010 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4449.) To Assembly. | |||
08/05/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
08/04/2010 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
07/15/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4273.) | |||
07/08/2010 | Set for hearing July 15. | |||
06/23/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4043.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
06/04/2010 | Set for hearing June 22. | |||
06/03/2010 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/27/2010 | Set for hearing June 15. | |||
05/04/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/20/2010 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
02/25/2010 | To Com. on T. & H. | |||
02/19/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |