|
07/28/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 23, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
07/28/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2009
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 2570.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 2571.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Motion to reconsider continued to next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 44. Noes 18. Page 2176.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Nava.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice (Com. on APPR.) suspended. (Page 2115.) From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 11.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 929.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 847.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 555.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
To Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|