|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 3789.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3672.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3180.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|