|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 2369.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 3069.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3039.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 15. Noes 4.) Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 1175.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 1068.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 420.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|