LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1171
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1171
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1171
Action History
04/05/2010
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
03/25/2010
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2986.)
03/09/2010
Set for hearing March 22.
03/04/2010
To Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS.
02/19/2010
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
02/18/2010
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.