|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 517, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4678.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6252.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 0. Page 3655.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3293.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|