|
09/29/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4886.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 6360.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Coms. on W.,P. & W. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 3623.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3427.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3299.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3002.)
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|