|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 325, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4944.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6243.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (June 21 amended measure version correcte June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in Committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
To Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3322.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3085.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|