|
07/01/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5694.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on NAT. RES. and AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 3737.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3672.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3301.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on F. & A. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3163.) Re-referred to Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and F. & A.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Coms. on F. & A. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|