|
09/30/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 6367.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. Read third time. Amended. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 3780.) Placed on third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 3780.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 5. Page 3660.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Corbett. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 3660.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3001.)
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|