LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB118
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB118
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB118
Compare Versions
SB118 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB118 Enrolled September 11, 2009
SB118 Amended September 3, 2009
SB118 Amended August 31, 2009
SB118 Amended August 17, 2009
SB118 Amended June 15, 2009
SB118 Amended June 1, 2009
SB118 Amended May 20, 2009
SB118 Amended April 20, 2009
SB118 Introduced February 2, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB118 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB118 Enrolled September 11, 2009
SB118 Amended September 3, 2009
SB118 Amended August 31, 2009
SB118 Amended August 17, 2009
SB118 Amended June 15, 2009
SB118 Amended June 1, 2009
SB118 Amended May 20, 2009
SB118 Amended April 20, 2009
SB118 Introduced February 2, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare