|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 108, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5852.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3542.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3466.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3403.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|