08/06/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2009. | |||
08/05/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
07/27/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
07/02/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
07/01/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2339.) To Senate. | |||
06/28/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/26/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 25.) | |||
05/28/2009 | To Com. on INS. | |||
05/14/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/14/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 898.) To Assembly. | |||
05/12/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To Consent Calendar. | |||
05/11/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 808.) | |||
04/23/2009 | Set for hearing May 5. | |||
03/25/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/17/2009 | Set for hearing March 31. | |||
02/23/2009 | To Com. on JUD. | |||
02/03/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 5. | |||
02/02/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |