|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4099.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5746.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3117.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3085.)
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|