|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 642, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 5083.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time. Amended. (Page 6850.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6874.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on August 25.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6608.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) Re-referred to Com. On JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6427.) To third reading. (August amended measure version corrected August 26.)
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 3789.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3673.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2010
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3445.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3444.) Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 5 in L. GOV. pending receipt.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|