California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1193 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2010

Amended

Bill August 16, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 23, 2010
Bill June 1, 2010
Bill May 5, 2010
Bill April 20, 2010
Bill April 5, 2010