07/01/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
06/15/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/20/2010 | To Com. on HUM. S. | |||
05/03/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/03/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3411.) To Assembly. | |||
04/27/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/26/2010 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
04/14/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3162.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/01/2010 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
03/25/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |||
03/23/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/19/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |