06/22/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/08/2010 | Set for hearing June 23. | |||
05/27/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/10/2010 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 12. | |||
04/20/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/20/2010 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/19/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |