|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 486, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4882.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 6334.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 3696.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 3547.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 4. Page 3498.) Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 3298.)
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|